Showing Collections: 1 - 3 of 3
Myrna Bair papers
Collection
Identifier: MSS 0689
Abstract
Myrna L. Bair served in the Delaware Senate from 1980 to 2000, representing Delaware's 5th District as a member of the Republican Party. For sixteen years, she held a legislative leadership position, including fourteen years as Senate minority leader and two years as minority whip. The bulk of the Myrna Bair papers documents her time as a senator and consists of legislation, correspondence, personal notes, press clippings, and other materials.
Dates:
1980-2008; Majority of material found within 1980-2000
Thomas R. Carper congressional papers
Collection
Identifier: MSS 0399
Abstract
Thomas R. Carper (1947- ) served the state of Delaware as its member-at-large in the U.S. House of Representatives for five terms: he was elected as a Democrat to the Ninety-eighth and to the four succeeding Congresses (January 3, 1983 - January 3, 1993). Carper served on the committees of Banking, Finance and Urban Affairs, and Merchant Marine and Fisheries, with memberships on several subcommittees. Carper was elected with the "budget conscious class of 1982" and was a fiscal conservative...
Dates:
1979-1993; Majority of material found within 1982-1992
Edward E. "Ted" Kaufman papers
Collection
Identifier: MSS 0660
Abstract
Edward E. "Ted" Kaufman (b. 1939) represented Delaware in the United States Senate from January 15, 2009 - November 15, 2010. Democrat Ted Kaufman was appointed by Governor Ruth Ann Minner to fill the Senate vacancy caused by the resignation of newly elected Vice President Joseph R. Biden, Jr.; Senator Ted Kaufman did not seek election to the office in a special election for the seat in November 2010. The bulk of the Ted Kaufman papers documents the 22 months he spent in the United States...
Dates:
1994-2013; Majority of material found within 2009-2010